HI HB2058 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds for certain dam and reservoir projects that improve facilities to protect public safety and provide significant benefits to the general public as important water resources.
Title
Dams and Reservoirs; Special Purpose Revenue Bonds
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 370-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-08 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say. |
2016-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 02-08-16 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2058&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2058_.HTM |