HI HB2046 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-3)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the month of September as Fetal Alcohol Spectrum Disorder Awareness Month to promote public awareness of the risks of alcohol consumption during pregnancy. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - House - House Legislative Management: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 494-20), recommending referral to JUD. |
2020-02-11 | House | The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Cullen, Nakashima, Morikawa, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2020-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Tuesday, 02-11-20 2:00PM in House conference room 312. |
2020-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2). |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 206-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LMG. |
2020-02-04 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Say. |
2020-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-04-20 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to HLT, LMG, JUD, referral sheet 4 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |