HI HB2045 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to CPN.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to CPN.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the law governing automatic renewal clauses to contracts with specified terms of one month or more and that renew for specified terms of one month or more. Requires that a notice of any material change be sent to the consumer no less than thirty days before the effective date of any material change. Exempts affiliates of insurers, providers of service contracts, and affiliates of those providers from the law governing automatic renewal clauses and continuous service clauses. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Automatic Renewals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 287). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-02-29 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Cochran, Garrett, Holt, Kahaloa, Lowen, Nishimoto, Quinlan, Todd excused (9). |
2024-02-29 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 683-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-02-27 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates. |
2024-02-27 | House | The votes in CPC were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates. |
2024-02-27 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on Tuesday, 02-27-24. |
2024-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled for reconsideration of previous decision by CPC on 02-27-24 2:00PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-31 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Onishi, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Lowen, Tam. |
2024-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 01-31-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 2 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |