HI HB2041 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 827).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 827).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys for the Department of Agriculture to establish an aquaculture incubator at the Natural Energy Laboratory of Hawaii Authority and to support the planning and participation of the Hawaii aquaculture industry in the Aquaculture America 2020 conference. Effective 7/1/2112. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Aquaculture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 827). |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Gabbard, K. Kahele Co-Chairs; Galuteria. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Evans, Ing, Lowen Co-Chairs; Say, Matsumoto. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 647) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3624) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Kidani. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from ETT/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3163) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Baker, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-18 1:25PM in conference room 414. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to ETT/AEN, WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 302). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1115-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Kobayashi. |
2018-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported from EDB/OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 395-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-02 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, DeCoite, Creagan, Gates, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-02 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB/OMH on Friday, 02-02-18 11:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to EDB/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |