HI HB2039 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that notwithstanding any law to the contrary or subsequent amendments to existing state renewable energy investment tax credits, a power purchase agreement approved by the public utilities commission prior to 12/31/2019 shall receive thirty-five per cent of the actual cost or up to the applicable cap amount of $500,000 per solar energy system.
Title
Relating To Renewable Energy Technologies Tax Credits.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3036 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:00PM in conference room 329.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2039&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2039_.HTM |