HI HB2034 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the membership of the Hawaii Community Development Authority by removing the county council as the nominating authority for the community development district representatives, removing one at-large member, reducing the number of district resident representatives, and making the Director of Planning and Permitting of each county a voting, rather than a nonvoting, member. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Community Development Authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Adrian Tam [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from WTL/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3486) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Fevella. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL/GVO, JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to WTL/GVO, JDC . |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 305). |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Kapela, Tokioka voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 941-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-23 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ward; 2 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Tokioka; and Excused: none. |
2022-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 286-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-02-08 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-08-22 9:00AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2683 (Same As) 2022-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.