HI HB2033 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-25 - (H) The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-25 - (H) The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits mortgage collection firms from certain acts, such as knowingly breaching a bona fide mortgage modification agreement. Provides penalties.
Title
Mortgage Collection Practices
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
Rep. Joey Manahan [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-25 | (H) The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Wednesday, 01-25-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2033 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB2033_.HTM |