HI HB2017 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning on 7/1/2024, requires that the state supplemental payment for type 1 adult residential care homes, licensed developmental disabilities domiciliary homes, community care foster family homes, and certified adult foster homes not exceed $1,136. Beginning on 7/1/2024, requires that the state supplemental payment for type II adult residential care homes not exceed $1,334.
Title
Related To Care Homes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2786 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - Referred to HHS, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2017&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2017_.HTM |