HI HB2015 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the composition, appointing authorities, and quorum requirements of the EUTF board of trustees. Effective January 7, 2059. (SD1)
Title
Hawaii Employer-union Health Benefits Trust Fund; Board of Trustees; Membership; Quorum
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported from JDL/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3103) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ihara, Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Kim, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, K.Kahele. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-16 1:17PM in conference room 414. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDL/GVO, WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 94). |
2016-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 815-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-16 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 356-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-12 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, San Buenaventura. |
2016-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-12-16 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-02-09 | House | Re-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 12 |
2016-02-01 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 02-02-16 9:30AM in conference room 309. |
2016-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-02-16 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2434 (Same As) 2016-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.