HI HB201 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the campaign finance law by: Defining "matching payment period"; Correcting statutory references; Changing report filing deadlines; Specifying noncandidate committee reporting requirements for contributions made; Requiring the identification of the candidate supported or opposed by an independent expenditure; and Increasing the amount of allowable expenditures made by a partially publicly financed candidate for the office of prosecuting attorney. (HB201 HD1)
Title
Elections; Campaign Spending
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 10:05AM in conference room 16. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 78). |
2013-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 705), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-13 3:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4). |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 326) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-01-31 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Cabanilla, Ito, Kawakami, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, C. Lee, Wooley. |
2013-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-31-13 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |