HI HB2005 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 184, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1293).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 184, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1293).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the University of Hawaii to issue revenue bonds for the purpose of financing the construction and maintenance of qualifying capital improvement projects. (SD2)
Title
Relating To University Of Hawaii Revenue Bonds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | House | Act 184, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1293). |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 184, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1293). |
2018-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 706). |
2018-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-05-03 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 702). |
2018-05-01 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-12-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 2:30PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 9:00AM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 9:00AM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-25-18 9:00AM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 801). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Kahele Chair; Keith-Agaran, S. Chang Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 638) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Taniguchi). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3629) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3007) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kim, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-18 1:20PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 173). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 957-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Kobayashi. |
2018-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy voting no (1) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 620-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-01 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Creagan, Kong, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Learmont, Quinlan. |
2018-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-01-18 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2018-01-30 | House | The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-01-18 2:00PM. |
2018-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 01-30-18 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |