HI HB2004 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-05 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Yamane excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-05 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Yamane excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the requirement that the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs conduct annual financial audits of the access organization because it is duplicative. Removes the sunset provision in Act 19, Session Laws of Hawaii 2011, thereby permanently allowing the Director of Commerce and Consumer Affairs to designate an access organization to oversee public, educational, and governmental channels. Effective June 29, 2014. (HB2004 HD1)
Title
Cable Television Systems; Access Organizations; Public Educational, and Governmental Channels
Sponsors
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] |
Rep. Justin Woodson [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Yamane excused (1). |
2014-02-05 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 164-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2014-01-29 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Creagan, Evans, Har, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. |
2014-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 01-29-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-01-27 | House | The committee on CPC recommends that the measure be deferred until 01-29-14. |
2014-01-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 01-27-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2048 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - Act 093, 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1194).