HI HB2000 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the school facilities authority to expand access to pre-kindergarten to eligible children. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824). |
2022-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2022-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 186-22). |
2022-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 186-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Eli, Kapela, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-22 3:30PM; Conference Room 229. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 229. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 229. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 229. |
2022-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 879). |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718). |
2022-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Eli Co-Chairs; Kapela, Okimoto. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715). |
2022-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 818) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3919) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-07-22 10:20AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3225) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 298). |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 986-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Perruso; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-02-22 1:00PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-25 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-02-22. |
2022-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-25-22 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 326-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-10 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Ohno, Quinlan, Takayama, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Clark. |
2022-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-10-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |