HI HB20 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates unspecified funds for salaries and benefits for lifeguards for Kua Bay, Kekaha Kai state park, on the Island of Hawaii, an area under the jurisdiction of DLNR. Effective July 1, 2030. (HB20 HD1)
Title
Lifeguards; Appropriation; Kua Bay; Kekaha Kai State Park; Island of Hawaii ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to WTL/PSM, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 157). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 865) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-28-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Takumi, Tokioka excused (4). |
2013-02-04 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 36), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-01-30 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, Kawakami, C. Lee, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-01-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 01-30-13 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-18 | House | Referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2013-01-17 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |