HI HB2 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1262).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1262).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes tiny homes of less than 500 square feet for farm workers in agricultural districts in a county with a population of more than 180,000 but less than 250,000. County council may adopt ordinances for the oversight of tiny homes, as defined in this act. (HB2 CD1)
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1262). |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Vetoed on 07-11-17 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1262). |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-23-17 (Gov. Msg. No. 1161) |
2017-06-23 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1161) |
2017-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, DeCoite, Har, LoPresti, McKelvey, Onishi, Oshiro, Thielen, Tokioka, Tupola voting no (10) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 34). |
2017-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 34) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2017-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, San Buenaventura, Evans; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-25-17 11:10AM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Gabbard Co-Chair; Ihara. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Creagan, San Buenaventura Co-Chairs; Evans, Thielen. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 545). |
2017-04-07 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 483) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, L. Thielen . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) English). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-06-17. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-17. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported from PSM/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1278) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-17 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to PSM/AEN. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 214). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Thielen, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) LoPresti voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 997) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-23 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-23-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 637) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-02-15 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, Gates, Ing, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, LoPresti, Thielen; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-15-17 10:50AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-02-13 | House | Re-referred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 17 |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to HSG/AGR, JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-19 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |