HI HB1990 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-19 - (H) Referred to HAW, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-19 - (H) Referred to HAW, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Short form bill.
Title
Native Hawaiian Recognition; Office of Hawaiian Affairs Package
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to HAW, referral sheet 2 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-17 | (H) Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
SB2181 (Same As) 2012-01-20 - (S) Referred to HWN.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1990 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1990_.HTM |