HI HB1988 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to HOU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to HOU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the counties' authorization to exercise the same powers as the Hawaii housing finance and development corporation for purposes of developing, constructing, financing, refinancing, or providing mixed-income projects and mixed-use developments. Authorizes units in low- and moderate-income housing projects to be made available to households with higher incomes if there is an insufficient number of persons or families who meet income qualifying requirements. Applies to bond proceeds expended by a county after 12/31/23. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To County Housing Powers.
Sponsors
Rep. Micah Aiu [D] | Rep. Luke Evslin [D] | Rep. Darius Kila [D] | Rep. Tyson Miyake [D] |
Rep. Jenna Takenouchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 276). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Amato voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1039-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-28 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-24 12:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Kapela, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3). |
2024-02-14 | House | Reported from HSG/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 331-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-07 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden, M. Mizuno. |
2024-02-07 | House | The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Kila, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/WAL on Wednesday, 02-07-24 8:30AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to HSG/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2062 (Same As) 2024-01-22 - Re-Referred to HOU, WAM.