HI HB1988 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale, import, harvest, or export of certain coral products, with certain exceptions. Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to amend its administrative rules accordingly no later than 12/31/2024. (SD3)
Title
Relating To Coral.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918). |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Inouye Co-Chair; Baker, Fevella. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718). |
2022-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Johanson Co-Chairs; Branco, McDermott. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715). |
2022-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 815) in amended form (SD 3). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chang . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Report filed. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Separated Committee Report. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 3). |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 4 offered. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3752) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Fevella. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-29-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3295) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL, CPN. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 293). |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 930-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-24-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 283-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2022-02-10 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden, Kong, McDermott. |
2022-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-10-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |