HI HB1988 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-11 - Re-Referred to AGL/EDU/EGH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-11 - Re-Referred to AGL/EDU/EGH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii Farm to School Program and Farm to School Coordinator position. Appropriates funds. Effective July 1, 2030. (HB1988 HD2)
Title
Hawaii Farm to School Program; Farm to School Coordinator; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to AGL/EDU/EGH, WAM. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to AGL/EDU, WAM. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 282). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 790-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-14 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-11 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll excused (2). |
2014-02-11 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 296-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2014-02-05 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Awana, Choy, Ichiyama, Matsumoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Say, Takai. |
2014-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-05-14 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2014-01-30 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Takai, Woodson excused (3). |
2014-01-30 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 40-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN. |
2014-01-27 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Awana, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Tokioka, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2014-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Monday, 01-27-14 9:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to AGR, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2564 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Referred to AGL/EDU, WAM.