HI HB1981 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to WAL/LAT, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to WAL/LAT, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to establish and conduct the Pupukea marine life conservation district carrying capacity pilot program. Appropriates moneys.
Title
Relating To The Pupukea Marine Life Conservation District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to WAL/LAT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3330 (Same As) 2022-06-13 - Act 031, on 06/08/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1131).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1981&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1981_.HTM |