HI HB198 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB198
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the county of Hawaii to appropriate the county's share of fuel tax revenue for the maintenance of substandard private subdivision roads that are used by the public. Provides that neither the State nor the county shall be required to install infrastructure improvements if the roads are thereafter sold to a private entity. Sunsets 6/30/22.
Title
Relating To Fuel Taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB273 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
HB198 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB198 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=198&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB198_.HTM |