HI HB1979 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - Referred to AEN/WTL, JDC.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - Referred to AEN/WTL, JDC.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires any person, before engaging in an activity with a high likelihood of resulting in an incidental take of a threatened or endangered species, to enter into a planning process with DLNR for the purpose of preparing and implementing a habitat conservation plan. Requires habitat conservation plans to include additional components. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Habitat Conservation Plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL, JDC. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 290). |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 940-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-23 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2022-02-16 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 405-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-02-10 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden, Kong, McDermott. |
2022-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-10-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3014 (Same As) 2022-02-14 - The committee(s) on AEN/WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-16-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.