HI HB1974 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:15pm in Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:15pm in Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DLIR to update the workers' compensation medical fee schedule annually. Authorizes DLIR to establish a workers' compensation medical fee ceiling that exceeds 110% of the fees prescribed in the Medicare Resource Based Relative Value Scale for Hawaii. Makes appropriations. Sunsets 6/30/2019. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Workers' Compensation Medical Fee Schedule; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:15pm in Conference Room 325. |
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 4:15pm in Conference Room 325. |
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2014-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 10:40AM in conference room 325. |
2014-04-17 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-23-14 10:40AM in conference room 325. |
2014-04-15 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-17-14 10:40AM in conference room 325. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673). |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Johanson Members. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Hee Chair; Ige Co-Chair; Slom Member. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 578) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3374) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kahele. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-14 9:25AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3045) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Gabbard, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Ihara. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-14 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 278). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 797-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Johanson, Cullen, Tokioka, Fukumoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2014-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-12-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-01-29 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Fukumoto, Johanson voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). |
2014-01-29 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 19-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-01-24 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Yamashita, Aquino, Ichiyama, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Johanson; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ing, Takumi. |
2014-01-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 01-24-14 8:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2923 (Same As) 2014-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Fukumoto, Johanson voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai, Thielen excused (2).