HI HB1973 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes a penalty on an employer who does not pay an employee temporary partial disability benefits within fourteen calendar days after the end of the employee's workweek as defined by administrative rule. Clarifies that an eligibility determination for disability benefits depends on the primary care physician to certify the employee's disability every thirty days. Clarifies that the failure of the employee's primary care physician to certify the dates of disability in an interim report does not disqualify the employee from disability benefits. Allows contemporaneous certification of an employee's disability status to be waived under certain conditions. Allows a one-time retroactive certification. Clarifies that certification requirements only apply during the period that an employee's injuries have not reach medical stabilization or the employee is enrolled in the vocational rehabilitation process. (SD1)
Title
Workers' Compensation; Penalty; Temporary Partial Disability Benefits; Eligibility Determination
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3046) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Galuteria, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2014-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-14 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 72). |
2014-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Fukumoto, Hanohano, Johanson, Kawakami, Matsumoto, Thielen, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Say excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 626-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-19 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Takayama, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Johanson, Onishi, Fukumoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2014-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-19-14 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Fale, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Johanson, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Awana, Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (4). |
2014-02-13 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 408-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-02-07 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Yamashita, Aquino, Ichiyama, Takayama, Ing, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Johanson; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane. |
2014-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-07-14 9:00AM in conference room 309. |
2014-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-14. |
2014-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-04-14 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2127 (Same As) 2014-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.