HI HB1972 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all use permits at the Ala Wai boat harbor to be obtained at public auction. Requires that public notice of the public auction for a use permit at the Ala Wai boat harbor be given and include certain information. Requires all public auctions for use permits at the Ala Wai boat harbor to be conducted by the chairperson of the board of land and natural resources or an authorized employee of the department of land and natural resources under the direction of the board of land and natural resources without additional compensation. Takes effect on 8/1/2018.
Title
Relating To State Small Boat Harbors.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2286 (Same As) 2018-02-23 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1972&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1972_.HTM |