HI HB1964 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-24 4:55 PM; CR 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-24 4:55 PM; CR 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Human Services to establish and implement a child care provider subsidy and bonus program to provide subsidies to retain the existing child care workforce in licensed infant and toddler child care centers, group child care centers, and group child care homes and bonuses to registered family child care homes. Requires annual reports to the Legislature. Makes appropriations. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. Takes effect 7/1/3000. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Early Child Care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-24 4:55 PM; CR 329. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-24 3:50 PM; CR 329. |
2024-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 1:55PM in conference room 329. |
2024-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-24 1:50PM in conference room 329. |
2024-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 772). |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Aquino Co-Chair; Awa. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 760). |
2024-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Marten, Takenouchi Co-Chairs; Amato, Garcia. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 545) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3703) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-24 10:15AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3207) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-24 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HHS, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 271). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 984-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-26 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-26-24 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-12 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 228-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-01 | House | The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Marten, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-01-24 9:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2603 (Same As) 2024-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Child Care Worker Subsidy and Bonus Program
DHS
Family Child Care Homes
General Fund Expenditure Ceiling Exceeded
Group Child Care Centers
Group Child Care Homes
Infant and Toddler Child Care Centers
Reports
Child Care Worker Subsidy and Bonus Program
DHS
Family Child Care Homes
General Fund Expenditure Ceiling Exceeded
Group Child Care Centers
Group Child Care Homes
Infant and Toddler Child Care Centers
Reports