HI HB1957 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to EET, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to EET, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the provision that made references to the base amount in the Internal Revenue Code inapplicable to the research activities tax credit and allowed credits for all qualified research expenses to be taken without regard to previous years expenses. Narrows the qualifying criteria for research activities tax credits to applicants who are small businesses registered in the State. Increases the maximum amount of tax credits that can be certified per year. Extends the sunset date of the research activities tax credit by five years. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Research Activities.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Darius Kila [D] | Rep. Rachele Fernandez Lamosao [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] |
Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] | Rep. Tyson Miyake [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 269). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 929-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-26 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Ward. |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-26-24 4:00PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-22 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-24. |
2024-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-24 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Takayama excused (2). |
2024-02-13 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 294-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-07 | House | The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Hussey-Burdick, Kong, Nakamura, Quinlan, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) La Chica. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-07-24 10:30AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-29 | House | Re-referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to ECD/HET, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |