HI HB1957 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on TCI with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Sagum, Wooley excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on TCI with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Sagum, Wooley excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes holding public events that celebrate Children and Youth Day to be held on state capitol grounds.
Title
Children and Youth Day and Month; Public Events; Capitol Grounds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on TCI with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Sagum, Wooley excused (3). | |
2010-02-01 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 20-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to TCI. | |
2010-01-28 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Brower, Nishimoto, Shimabukuro, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Bertram, Carroll, Ward. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 01-28-10 9:00AM in conference room 329. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 01-28-10. | |
2010-01-21 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Monday, 01-25-10 8:30am in House conference room 329. | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Referred to HUS, TCI, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-15 | (H) Pending introduction. |