HI HB1949 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits monies in the John A. Burns School of Medicine Special Fund to be used for loan repayment for certain health care professionals. Extends the sunset date from the physician workforce assessment fee and related requirements for use of monies in the John A. Burns School of Medicine Special Fund. (HB1949 HD1)
Title
John A. Burns School of Medicine Special Fund; Loan Repayment; Physician Workforce Assessment; Fee
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 522-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-04 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Kong, Ohno, Say, Takumi, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2016-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 02-04-16 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2388 (Same As) 2016-03-10 - Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 26