HI HB1948 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, C. Lee, M. Lee, Tokioka excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, C. Lee, M. Lee, Tokioka excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Strengthens existing law to require proof of identification from sellers of agricultural commodities. Makes the failure to maintain required certificates while in possession of agricultural commodities prima facie evidence of the offense of theft in the second degree. Effective July 1, 2012. (HB1948 HD1)
Title
Agriculture; Theft in the Second Degree; Agricultural Commodities
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-15 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, C. Lee, M. Lee, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-02-15 | (H) Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 436-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2012-02-08 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Hashem, Awana, Brower, Choy, Evans, McKelvey, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-08-12 9:00AM in conference room 312. | |
2012-02-03 | (H) The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-12. | |
2012-01-31 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-03-12 8:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-17 | (H) Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
SB2914 (Same As) 2012-01-27 - (S) Referred to AGL, JDL.