HI HB194 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies qualifications for the State Historic Preservation Officer pursuant to federal law. Requires notice to the Legislature of appointment. Converts positions in the State Historic Preservation Division of DLNR to civil service status. Effective July 1, 2030. (HD194 HD2)
Title
State Historic Preservation; Qualifications; Civil Service
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] |
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] |
Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 191). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Hanohano, Har, Jordan, Oshiro, Rhoads, Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 773) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-13 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Hanohano voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Tokioka excused (2). |
2013-02-14 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 441) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-11 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, Fale; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-11-13 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-08-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-01 | House | Re-referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 11 |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to VMI/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |