HI HB1936 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 22 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1158)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 22 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1158)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Mandates that the Department of Transportation require the securing of mooring lines from vessels to commercial docks, wharves, piers, quays, and landings to be performed by labor subject to collective bargaining. Sunsets 7/1/2028. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Harbor Safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-21 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1158) |
2024-06-21 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-21-24 (Gov. Msg. No. 1158) |
2024-04-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 782). |
2024-04-19 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick, Poepoe voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cochran, Garcia excused (2). |
2024-04-18 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 771). |
2024-04-18 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-24. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 542) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3715) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Kidani. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-24 10:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3340) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-24 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Re-Referred to TCA, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to TCA/LBT, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 263). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Marten, Poepoe voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 910-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-27 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Lowen, Onishi, Tam; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates. |
2024-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-27-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Poepoe voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3). |
2024-02-14 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 336-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2024-02-08 | House | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Miyake, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 02-08-24 9:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2746 (Same As) 2024-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso, Poepoe voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima excused (2).