HI HB1932 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-04 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with Representative(s) Finnegan voting no (1) and none excused (0).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-04 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with Representative(s) Finnegan voting no (1) and none excused (0).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides penalties for the misbranding of fish or fish products that result in consumer illness. Creates the food misbranding special fund to support Department of Health inspectors investigating incidents of fish or fish products misbranding. (HB1932 HD1)
Title
Fish Labeling; Fines; Special Fund
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-04 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with Representative(s) Finnegan voting no (1) and none excused (0). | |
2010-02-04 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 112-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. | |
2010-02-02 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Yamane, Nishimoto, Bertram, Brower, Mizuno, Shimabukuro; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Finnegan; and 2 Excused: Belatti, Carroll. | |
2010-01-29 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-02-10 10:00 AM in House conference room 329. | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-14 | (H) Pending introduction. |