HI HB1928 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the state historic preservation division to approve or make a determination within forty-five days on a properly completed and submitted application for public and private work. Deems the application to be approved if state historic preservation division does not make a determination within forty-five days. If the application is rejected, requires state historic preservation division to explain in writing.
Title
Relating To Historic Preservation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 01-30-24 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1928&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1928_.HTM |