HI HB192 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB192
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Hawaii Health Authority to continue planning for the adoption of a universal, publicly-administered health-care-for-all insurance model with a single payout agency. Establishes a rate stabilization reserve fund for the Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund. Transfers funds from the other post-employment benefits trust fund to the rate stabilization reserve fund. Makes appropriations.
Title
Relating To Health Care Insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HHH/LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB444 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB192 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HHH/LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB192 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HHH/LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=192&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB192_.HTM |