HI HB192 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - The committee on EGH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - The committee on EGH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeal the de novo standard of review for administrative review of hearing officer's decisions of protests.
Title
Procurement; Administrative Review
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Mele Carroll [D] |
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee on EGH deferred the measure. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-13-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=192&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HB192_.HTM |