HI HB1919 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-25 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 823).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-25 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 823).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a state boating facility lease program within the Department of Land and Natural Resources to lease 1 state small boat harbor for private development, management, maintenance, and operation. Repeals provisions related to the leasing of fast lands and submerged lands of the Ala Wai boat harbor. Appropriates moneys out of the boating special fund. Repeals on 6/30/2044. Effective 7/1/3000. (SD2)
Title
Relating To State Boating Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 823). |
2024-04-25 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ichiyama, Poepoe Co-Chairs; Souza. |
2024-04-24 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 777). |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Moriwaki Chair; Wakai, Fevella. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 536) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) DeCoite, Fevella, Ihara, Kanuha, McKelvey, Richards, San Buenaventura. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Awa, Elefante, Inouye). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 2). Aye(s) with reservations: None. Noes, 4 (Senator(s) DeCoite, Inouye, McKelvey, San Buenaventura). |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 3 offered. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3476) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Shimabukuro ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-01-24 10:50AM; CR 211. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-24 9:50AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 108). |
2024-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Amato, Morikawa, Souza voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Belatti, Garrett, Gates, Hussey-Burdick, Kahaloa, Kapela, Kila, La Chica, Lowen, Marten, Perruso voting no (11) and Representative(s) Cochran, Quinlan, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 846-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-26 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Chun, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Kila, Lamosao, Morikawa, Alcos; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Kahaloa, Kobayashi; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-26-24 3:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tam voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 500-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-06 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ganaden, Morikawa, Souza; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-06-24 10:15AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-01-24 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2555 (Same As) 2024-02-14 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.