HI HB1917 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the deadline for the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation to renegotiate an existing, or issue a new, ground lease for the Front Street Apartments affordable housing project before the corporation's requirement to initiate condemnation proceedings for five years. Takes effect 7/30/2075. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Affordable Housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Housing: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Housing: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718). |
2022-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakamura, McKelvey, Ilagan Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, McDermott. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715). |
2022-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 807) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3910) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | The committee on JDC/WAM has rescheduled its decision making to 04-05-22 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-22 10:05AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3456) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Moriwaki, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference (Proposed Draft). |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee on HOU will reconsider its previous decision on 03-15-22 and will hold a public hearing on 03-22-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to HOU, JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 288). |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 971-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-24-22 12:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2022-02-16 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 445-22), recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-02-14 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2022-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-14-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-11-22 2:15PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 48-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-02-03 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, Clark, Ilagan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa, LoPresti, Takumi, McDermott. |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 02-03-22 9:30AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to HSG, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2667 (Same As) 2022-04-20 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
Subjects
Affordable Housing
Extension
Front Street Apartments
Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation
Extension
Front Street Apartments
Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation