HI HB1914 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the Aging and Disability Resource Center.
Title
Making An Appropriation For The Aging And Disability Resource Center.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2589 (Same As) 2018-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1914&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1914_.HTM |