HI HB1911 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to conduct a study examining the feasibility of establishing a noncommercial fishing license program. Appropriates funds. (SD1)
Title
DLNR; Fishing; Fishing License; Study; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3028) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Galuteria, Dela Cruz, Ihara, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 03-19-14 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-14 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 271). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Aquino, Hashem, Ichiyama, Ing, Johanson, Jordan, Lowen, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Onishi, Oshiro, Say, Takayama, Thielen, Tsuji, Yamashita, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Awana, Cullen, Fale, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Har, Ito, Kawakami, McDermott, Morikawa, Tokioka, Ward voting no (12) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 902-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Hashem, Ing, Takayama, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Onishi, Tokioka, Fukumoto, Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-14 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll, Mizuno, Oshiro excused (4). |
2014-02-12 | House | Reported from WAL/OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 379-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-02-05 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, C. Lee, Lowen, Say, Nishimoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano. |
2014-02-05 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Kawakami, C. Lee, Say, Nishimoto, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano. |
2014-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-05-14 11:00AM in conference room 325. |
2014-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on WAL/OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Friday, 01-31-14 9:15AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to WAL/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |