HI HB1901 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-07 - The committee(s) on HHS/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-07 - The committee(s) on HHS/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DHS, in collaboration with DOH, to review the progress of the Hawaii pathways project pilot and continue to pursue efforts to utilize medicaid to provide supportive housing services for chronically homeless individuals. Provides considerations for DHS in planning for the expansion of supportive housing services provided through medicaid managed care plans. Requires DHS to report to the legislature. Makes an appropriation.
Title
Relating To Human Services.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on HHS/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS/HSG on Wednesday, 02-07-18 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to HHS/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Health
Department of Human Services
Homelessness
Medicaid
Supportive Housing Services
Department of Health
Department of Human Services
Homelessness
Medicaid
Supportive Housing Services
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1901&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1901_.HTM |