HI HB1896 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-24 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-24 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits an accident and health or sickness insurer, mutual benefit society, health maintenance organization, or dental service organization from requiring a dentist who provides services to its subscribers to accept a fee set by the accident and health or sickness insurer, mutual benefit society, health maintenance organization, or dental service organization unless the services are covered under the applicable subscriber agreement. Effective July 1, 2020. (HB1896 HD1)
Title
Dental Services; Contracts
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-24 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-02-18 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-24-10 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-02-17 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-24-10. | |
2010-02-10 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-17-10 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Magaoay, Sagum excused (3). | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 182-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2010-01-26 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Nishimoto, Bertram, Brower, Mizuno, Shimabukuro, Finnegan; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 01-26-10 9:00 am in House conference room 329. | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 1 | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-13 | (H) Pending introduction. |