HI HB1894 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Human Services to contract the services of a dedicated capture manager responsible for securing grant and other funding opportunities for the Department of Human Services. Makes an appropriation. (HB1894 HD1)
Title
Relating To Human Services.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2). |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 132-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-01 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Thursday, 02-01-18 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2536 (Same As) 2018-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.