HI HB1893 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - The committee(s) on EEP/WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - The committee(s) on EEP/WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends Act 153, Session Laws of Hawaii 2022, to increase the cesspool compliance pilot grant project grant amount and update a reference. Appropriates funds for fiscal year 2024-2025 and to establish positions to implement the pilot grant project.
Title
Relating To Cesspool Conversions.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Luke Evslin [D] | Rep. Kirstin Kahaloa [D] | Rep. Lisa Kitagawa [D] |
Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on EEP/WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WAL on Tuesday, 02-13-24 9:05AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to EEP/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2360 (Same As) 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1893&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1893_.HTM |