HI HB1893 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for the medical use of cannabidiol products upon approval by the Federal Food and Drug Administration. (HB1893 HD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-18 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to PSM, CPH. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 287). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Tokioka voting no (1) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1079-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-01-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 727-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-02-15 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Tupola. |
2018-02-12 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Thursday, 02-15-18 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Thursday, 02-01-18 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to HHS, JUD, referral sheet 4 |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |