HI HB1893 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:30pm in Conference Room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:30pm in Conference Room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes income tax return designations to the disaster response special fund. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Income Tax; Check-off Box; Disaster Response Special Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:30pm in Conference Room 309. |
2014-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-25-14 5:00PM in conference room 309. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 689). |
2014-04-15 | House | House Conferees Changed: Representative Luke added as Chair. Representatives Jordan discharged as Chair; Added as Member. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673). |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Jordan Chair; Yamane, Johanson Members. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Chun Oakland Chair; Kidani Co-Chair; Slom Member. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 564) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3405) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-14 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2913) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Kidani, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-14 1:00PM in conference room 016. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 265). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Wooley excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Luke, Nakashima, Thielen, Woodson excused (5). |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 685-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2014-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-12-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2362 (Same As) 2014-02-06 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.