HI HB1892 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Department of Agriculture to establish a five-year food hub pilot program to increase access to local food. Provides for the award of grant funding by qualified applicants wishing to establish or expand a food hub. Requires reports to the legislature. Appropriates funds. Takes effect on 7/1/2112. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To A Food Hub Pilot Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Economic Development & Business: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 1:20PM in conference room 224.
2020-03-03SenateReferred to AEN, WAM.
2020-02-28SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-02-28SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 37).
2020-02-27HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Kong excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-27HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 706-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-20HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2020-02-18HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-20 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
2020-02-14HouseReported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 634-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-02-12HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-02-10HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-12-20 10:35AM in conference room 309.
2020-02-07HouseThe committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-20.
2020-02-05HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-07-20 9:30AM in conference room 309.
2020-02-05HouseThe committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-20.
2020-02-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-05-20 9:35AM in House conference room 309.
2020-01-30HouseRe-referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 9
2020-01-23HouseReferred to AGR/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 3
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-17HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2722 (Same As) 2020-06-22 - The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback