HI HB1889 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-19 - (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-19 - (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises both the retirement allowance of persons who become members of the ERS after June 30, 2012, and who have credited service as judges as well as the average final compensation of persons who become members of the ERS after June 30, 2012, and who have credited service as elective officers or as legislative officers.
Title
Employees' Retirement System
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-17 | (H) Prefiled |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1889 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1889_.HTM |