HI HB1882 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-25 - (H) The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-25 - (H) The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the membership of the public utilities commission from three to five; temporarily creates two subject matter panels within the public utilities commission; authorizes the employment of an executive officer; provides for transition to five-member composition; requires report to the legislature on panel structure; makes appropriation from the public utilities commission special fund.
Title
Public Utilities Commission; Commissioners; Staff; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-25 | (H) The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 01-25-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-17 | (H) Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
SB2439 (Same As) 2012-01-31 - (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1882 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1882_.HTM |