HI HB1881 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to restore staff and long-term care services at Leahi and Maluhia hospitals within the Hawaii health systems corporation.
Title
Leahi Hospital; Maluhia Hospital; Hawaii Health Systems Corporation; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2064 (Same As) 2016-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1881&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1881_.HTM |